MD HB1105 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the custodian of a public record to provide written notice to an applicant regarding the applicant's right to file a complaint with the State Public Information Act Compliance Board; requiring the Public Access Ombudsman to investigate, evaluate, and issue a report concerning the Howard County Public School System concerning specified matters; requiring the Howard County Board of Education, Howard County Superintendent of Schools, and the Howard County Public School System to provide the Ombudsman with specified records; etc.
Title
Howard County Public School System - Access to Public Information Ho. Co. 9-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {135762/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
Disclosure
Education
Education, Boards of
Howard County
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures