MD HB1105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-10)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force on the Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program to investigate ways to assist disabled individuals and their families to establish savings accounts to pay qualified expenses for specified disabled individuals; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2015; requiring the General Assembly to consider legislation proposed by the Task Force to establish an ABLE program; etc.
Title
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-04-09 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senators Serafini, Guzzone, and Ferguson |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-06 | House | Delegates Zucker, Sophocleus, and Carozza |
2015-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-06 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2015-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {259438/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {964961/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Education
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Fees
Forms
Health
Hearings
Higher Education
Housing
Income Tax
Investments
Job Training
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Nonresidents
Power of Attorney
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Tuition
Vocational Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Disabled
Education
Estates and Trusts
Exemptions
Fees
Forms
Health
Hearings
Higher Education
Housing
Income Tax
Investments
Job Training
Legislation
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Nonresidents
Power of Attorney
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Transportation
Tuition
Vocational Rehabilitation