MD HB1105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a retail alcoholic beverages licensee in Prince George's County from selling alcoholic beverages by means of a self-scanning cash register or a specified other automated system that may be operated on a self-service basis by a customer; specifying a penalty; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash Registers PG 311-13
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-20) (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-8) (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-20) (Y: 118 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-8) (Y: 127 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667 |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-20) |
2013-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Benson) Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {864533/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-8) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Equipment
Fines
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County