MD HB1104 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a specified affidavit or specified other proof may be provided as evidence of a domestic partnership to qualify for an exemption from the inheritance tax on the receipt of interest in real property held in joint tenancy that passes from a decedent to a domestic partner.
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Evidence of Domestic Partnership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-2) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-2) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {915362/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-01 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions
Exemptions
Inheritance Tax
Interest
Real Property
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Exemptions
Inheritance Tax
Interest
Real Property
Taxes - Miscellaneous