MD HB1102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $9,665,300 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public facilities in Calvert County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115 |
2018-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Calvert County
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Financial Institutions
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Water
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Financial Institutions
Interest
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Revenue and Taxes
Water