MD HB1100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-16 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators to set certain fees so as to produce funds sufficient to cover certain costs of regulating waterworks, wastewater works, and industrial wastewater works in accordance with certain provisions of law; continuing the Board in accordance with the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Waterworks and Waste Systems Operators - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-19HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-18HouseReassigned to Environment and Transportation
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback