MD HB110 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable if they prohibit or unreasonably restrict the installation or use of electric vehicle recharging equipment; requiring certain owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for certain costs and disclosures; requiring a unit owner or lot owner to obtain certain permits or approval; etc.
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 114 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455 |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (114-25) |
2021-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {118975/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-18) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {440919/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-09-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB144 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 456
Subjects
Codes
Condominiums
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Grants
Homeowners Associations
Insurance
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Parking
Property Managers
Public Works
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Condominiums
Construction
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Grants
Homeowners Associations
Insurance
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Notices
Parking
Property Managers
Public Works
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 111.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 111.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |