MD HB110 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the St. Mary's County Sheriff to establish a pretrial release program and a prerelease program; authorizing a certain inmate to leave a certain detention center for certain purposes; repealing a provision authorizing the Sheriff and the Board of County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to charge a certain inmate a certain amount or fee to pay for certain costs; requiring the Sheriff or the Sheriff's designee to collect the earnings of a certain inmate, less any payroll deduction required by law; etc.
Title
St. Mary's County - Inmate Release Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 741 |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Fees
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
St. Mary's County
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Fees
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Public Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
St. Mary's County