MD HB110 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to fiscal year 2020 the Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Rebate Program and authorization to issue motor vehicle excise tax credits for specified qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; increasing a specified amount required to be transferred from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund; increasing, from $1,800,000 to $3,600,000 the total amount of motor vehicle excise tax credits that may be issued during a fiscal year; etc.
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Energy Matters
Excise Tax
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Excise Tax
Industry and Technology
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Transportation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration