MD HB110 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $4,625,000, the proceeds to be used as grants to the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the Maryland State Department of Education for the renovation, repair, and capital improvements of qualified zone academies; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds and the further grant of funds to eligible school systems for specified purposes, subject to a requirement that the grantees document the provision of a required matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy Bonds
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-6) (Y: 133 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended Referred (Senator DeGrange) Adopted |
2015-04-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-6) |
2015-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-30 | House | Special Order until 4/1 (Delegate Jones) Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)