MD HB11 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Leasing Training Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to train, prepare, and connect job seekers with careers in the residential rental housing industry; requiring the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning to administer the Program and award $250,000 annually in grants to eligible designated partnerships; requiring the Governor to include $250,000 in the annual budget bill for each of fiscal years 2026, 2027, and 2028 for the program; requiring a certain report by January 1 each year; etc.
Title
Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Leasing Training Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2023-10-26 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-18 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Associations
Budgets
Governor
Grants
Interest
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Landlords and Tenants
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Associations
Budgets
Governor
Grants
Interest
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Landlords and Tenants
Nonprofit Organizations
Partnerships
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1606 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |