MD HB11 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "Tier 1 renewable source" for purposes of excluding energy derived from qualifying biomass, methane from the anaerobic decomposition of organic materials, certain fuel cells, poultry litter-to-energy, waste-to-energy, refuse-derived fuel, and thermal energy from a thermal biomass system from being eligible for inclusion in the renewable energy portfolio standard.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard – Tier 1 Renewable Source – Alterations (Reclaim Renewable Energy Act of 2022)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Agriculture
Energy
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Trees
Utility Regulation
Weeds
Weights and Measures
Energy
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Trees
Utility Regulation
Weeds
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |