MD HB11 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to provide for retention elections for judges of the circuit courts; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution altering the mandatory retirement age for certain judges under certain circumstances; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to increase the number of years between successive retention elections for judges of the Court of Appeals and Court of Special Appeals; etc.
Title
Judges - Election, Retention, and Mandatory Retirement Age
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2020-01-13 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2020-01-13 | House | Hearing canceled (Judiciary) |
2020-01-10 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 2:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2019-10-15 | House | Pre-filed |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Circuit Courts
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
District Courts
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Judges
Referendum
Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
IV - Judiciary Department | 18B | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 3A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 41D | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5A | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
IV - Judiciary Department | 5B | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0011?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0011f.pdf |