MD HB11 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name of the Edward T. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program to the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program; and altering the eligibility requirements for the Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and the Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program to include the stepchildren of specified individuals who are at least 16 years of age.
Title
Edward T. and Mary A. Conroy and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Programs - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444137/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {945666/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m. |
2015-01-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 2:15 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-11-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
General Assembly
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Names
Public Employees
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Victims
Violence
General Assembly
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Minors
Names
Public Employees
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Victims
Violence