MD HB1093 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that requirements of certain laws specifying a certain document be in a certain form or signed as a condition for recording are met by an electronic document or electronic signature under certain circumstances; requiring the clerk of a circuit court to continue to accept paper documents and place entries for electronic and paper documents in the same index under certain circumstances, and transmit documents in fully verified books to the State Archives for preservation and publication on the Archives' website; etc.
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Electronic Recording Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 516 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {820112/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Archives
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Real Property
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Archives
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Real Property
Records
Telecommunications and Information Technology