MD HB1090 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual or a person from taking certain actions to provide false location information when placing a telephone call with the intent to defraud, harass, cause harm, or wrongfully obtain anything of value; providing for the application of the Act; and establishing a certain penalty for providing false location information when placing a call.
Title
Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515 |
2018-04-09 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2018-04-09 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {857677/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923594/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Fraud
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Utility Regulation
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Fraud
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Utility Regulation