MD HB109 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Elevator Safety Review Board to add a member representing the elevator interior renovation industry.
Title
Public Safety - Elevator Safety Review Board - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Senators Astle, Kelley, and Kittleman | |
2012-03-31 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-6) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments 417873/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-03 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (123-0) | |
2012-04-03 | House Concur - Senate Amendment | |
2012-03-31 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2012-03-31 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 113697/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Economic Matters |