MD HB1087 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-26 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception to the prohibition against leaving an unattended motor vehicle under specified circumstances for a motor vehicle that operates unattended for a specified period of time under specified circumstances.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Prohibition Against Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {340015/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |