MD HB108 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that the council of unit owner's property insurance deductible is a common expense if the cause of any damage to the condominium originates from an event outside the condominium units and common elements; increasing, from $5,000 to $10,000, the maximum amount of the council of unit owners' property insurance deductible for which a unit owner is responsible; applying the Act to all policies of property and casualty insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State to a condominium council of unit owners; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums - Responsibility for Property Insurance Deductibles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 56
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-21SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB175 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 57

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property11114(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback