MD HB1077 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Specifying that the application fee for a structural shoreline stabilization project that impacts a wetland or waterway of a State-owned lake may not exceed $750; and requiring the Department of the Environment, in conjunction with the Department of Natural Resources, to identify up to three structural stabilization practices that may be implemented on a wetland or waterway of a State-owned lake.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline Stabilization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {910018/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback