MD HB1076 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the deadline for a new owner of a dwelling to submit an application to the State Department of Assessments and Taxation requesting that the date of the deed be accepted as the date of transfer of the dwelling for purposes of the homestead tax credit under certain circumstances; providing that property tax is not due on a dwelling for a certain taxable year until 30 days after a revised tax bill is sent to the homeowner if the homeowner submits a certain application after a certain date under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Date of Transfer of Dwelling
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 420 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Deeds
Land Records
Notices
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Time
Deeds
Land Records
Notices
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |