MD HB1075 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from administering an antibiotic drug to a food-producing animal under specified circumstances; requiring the State Department of Agriculture to establish by regulation a specified program; requiring regulations adopted by the Department to include specified provisions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
2015-03-12HouseHearing cancelled
2015-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-19HouseReassigned to Environment and Transportation
2015-02-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback