MD HB1073 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain members of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System to receive credit for certain military service even if the member receives military service credit in another retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Military Service Credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions38104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback