MD HB1069 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an owner of residential rental property that is served by a private water supply well to provide water quality testing every 3 years and to disclose to a tenant certain results; requiring the owner of a residential rental property that is served by a private water supply well to notify the Department of the Environment and the local health department about well contamination, provide a potable water supply until the contamination is remediated and resolve the contamination within 60 days after learning of the contamination; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Floor Amendment 853226/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 92 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - Floor Amendment 603929/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 89 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (89-46)
2021-04-12HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Barve) Adopted (90-45)
2021-04-12HouseMotion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (37-10)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {564436/1 Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-24SenateHearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (89-46)
2021-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-22HouseFloor Amendment {853226/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (38-92)
2021-03-22HouseFloor Amendment {603929/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (42-89)
2021-03-20HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {630819/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-07HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment9-4A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A10(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A11(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A12(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A13(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A14(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A15(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A16(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A5(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A6(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A7(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A8(n/a)See Bill Text
Environment9-4A9(n/a)See Bill Text
Real Property10711(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13201(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13202(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13203(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13204.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - Property13209(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1069?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1069f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1069t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1069e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_63081901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_60392901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_85322601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_56443601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1069_ent.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1069_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0741.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0742.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0795.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback