MD HB1069 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a provision of law that provides for the confidentiality of certain court records pertaining to certain children does not prohibit review of a court record by the Department of Juvenile Services if the Department is providing treatment, services, or care to a child who is subject of the record; and altering a certain exception to a provision of law that provides for the confidentiality of certain court records pertaining to certain children.
Title
Juvenile Causes - Court Records
Sponsors
Del. Nicole Williams [D] | Del. Sandy Bartlett [D] | Del. Dan Cox [R] | Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D] |
Del. Wanika Fisher [D] | Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Del. Lesley Lopez [D] | Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 827 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 8A-27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |