MD HB1069 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-10)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 582
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {909333/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateSpecial Order until 4/2 (Senator Smith) Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {909333/1
2018-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {675464/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1069&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1069f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1069t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1069e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_582_hb1069e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_67546401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1069_90933301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb1069.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1069_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0578.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1069_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1095.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback