MD HB1065 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a title service agent that collects and remits vehicle excise taxes on behalf of the Motor Vehicle Administration to keep the lesser of certain amounts of the gross vehicle excise taxes collected by the title service agent, subject to record-keeping requirements; increasing to $50,000 the required surety bond that a title service agent is required to file; clarifying that a title service agent may transport certain documents to or from the Administration physically or electronically; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 512
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-17HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-15HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-01HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback