MD HB106 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the defined term "emergency vehicle" to include certain organ delivery vehicles; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to designate an organ delivery vehicle as an emergency vehicle only if it is registered to a federally designated organ procurement organization or a professional organ transportation organization; authorizing the driver of an emergency vehicle to exercise certain privileges while transporting human organs or medical personnel; authorizing organ delivery vehicles to be equipped with certain devices; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery Vehicles

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed (41-0)
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {210615/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-06HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-12HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback