MD HB105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to determine and implement the license fees for certain alcoholic beverages licenses in Harford County; requiring the Board to determine certain license fees in proportion to the amount of alcoholic beverages sales from each applicable license holder as a percentage of the total sales from alcoholic beverages in the county; and repealing the specified annual fees of certain licenses.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Fees
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Commerce and Business
Fees
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Revenue and Taxes