MD HB1049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB107
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person who makes an automatic renewal offer to consumers to allow a consumer to cancel the automatic renewal in a certain manner; requiring automatic renewal offers to be displayed in a certain manner and contain certain information; establishing that compliance with certain regulations shall be considered to be compliance with the Act; and establishing that a violation of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice.
Title
Consumer Protection - Automatic Renewals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-9) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903929/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB1049 (Carry Over) 2024-03-18 - Referred Finance
SB1040 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
SB1040 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-06 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Documents
Notices
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Credit
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Documents
Notices
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Time
Unfair Trade Practices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 1328 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |