MD HB1048 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a local board of elections to designate ballot drop box locations; requiring each local board to submit the proposed locations to the State Administrator of Elections for approval; requiring a local board to ensure the security of ballot drop boxes; requiring the State Board to establish certain chain of custody procedures related to the ballot drop boxes; requiring that certain guidelines for absentee voting established by the State Board of Elections provide for a permanent absentee ballot list; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Voting - Permanent Absentee Ballot List, Ballot Drop Boxes, and Reports

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - Floor Amendment 833121/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Floor Amendment 793427/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Floor Amendment 833924/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Floor Amendment 223023/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - Floor Amendment 153327/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (97-42)
2021-04-08HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (32-15)
2021-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {174735/1 Adopted
2021-03-31SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments {174735/1
2021-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-09SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (95-38)
2021-03-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-04HouseFloor Amendment {833121/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (39-95)
2021-03-04HouseFloor Amendment {793427/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-94)
2021-03-04HouseFloor Amendment {833924/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (38-94)
2021-03-04HouseFloor Amendment {223023/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (43-89)
2021-03-04HouseFloor Amendment {153327/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (41-93)
2021-03-03HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2021-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {975260/1 Adopted
2021-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-02-10HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law1101(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law16206(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2304(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law2305(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9303(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9305(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9310(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law9311.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1048?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1048f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1048t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb1048e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_97526001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_15332701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_22302301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_83392401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_79342701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_83312101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_17473501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb1048_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0281.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0282.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0283.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0284.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0285.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0317.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1214.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback