MD HB1048 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person authorized to sell residential property subject to foreclosure to file a notice of foreclosure with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under specified circumstances; establishing that a notice of foreclosure may be filed through the Foreclosed Property Registry; requiring that the notice of foreclosure contain specified information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349
2017-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2017-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-03-31SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments {188074/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-30SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {910311/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1048&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1048f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1048t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1048e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_349_hb1048e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_91031101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0008/hb1048_18807401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb1048.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1048_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1048_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1048,h-0334&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1048,s-0979&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1048,h-1045&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback