MD HB1042 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to issue an executor license to an applicant if the applicant is the appointed personal representative of a deceased surviving spouse's estate under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for an executor license to submit to the Board within a specified time period the name of a licensed funeral director or mortician who has agreed to apply for a specified pre-need trustee license; requiring the Board to provide for the term of an executor license; etc.
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Funeral Establishments Owned by a Single Owner - Pre-Need Trustee Licenses and Public Notification of Death
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {794937/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {466781/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Cremation
Death
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Marriage
Morticians
News Media
Notices
Personal Representatives
Public Information
Records
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Cremation
Death
Estates and Trusts
Funerals
Health Occupations
Licenses
Marriage
Morticians
News Media
Notices
Personal Representatives
Public Information
Records
Signs and Billboards
Telecommunications and Information Technology