MD HB1035 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the tax collector in Baltimore City to withhold specified owner-occupied residential property from a tax sale when the taxes on the property are under $750; exempting a person redeeming specified owner-occupied residential property in Baltimore City from the requirement that the person pay the tax collector any taxes, interest, and penalties accruing after the date of the tax sale; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-4) (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114 |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {665469/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Courts
Fees
Foreclosure
Housing
Judgments
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Notices
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Sewage
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Water
Baltimore City
Civil Actions
Courts
Fees
Foreclosure
Housing
Judgments
Land Records
Laws and Ordinances
Liens
Notices
Postal Service
Property Tax
Real Property
Sewage
Tax Sales
Taxes - Property
Water