MD HB103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Department of Human Resources to be the Department of Human Services; renaming the Secretary of Human Resources to be the Secretary of Human Services; providing that the Department of Human Services is the successor of the Department of Human Resources; renaming the Child Support Enforcement Administration to be the Child Support Administration; etc.
Title
Department of Human Resources and Child Support Enforcement Administration - Renaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Human Resources, Department of
Names
Public Officials
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Support of Dependents
Annotated Code of Maryland
Human Resources, Department of
Names
Public Officials
Social Services - Generally
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Support of Dependents