MD HB1028 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified licensed real estate salespersons and licensed associate real estate brokers, with the consent of a specified licensed real estate broker, to form a specified business entity; authorizing payment of compensation for the provision of real estate brokerage services to a specified business entity under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions
Sponsors
Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] |
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Real Estate
Salaries and Compensation
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Corporations
Real Estate
Salaries and Compensation