MD HB1028 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each operator of a specified automated teller machine to install and maintain a video camera that views and records an image of a user as the user performs a transaction at the automated teller machine; requiring the operator to preserve the recordings made by the video camera for at least 45 calendar days; providing that an operator of a specified automated teller machine is not in violation of provisions of the Act in cases of specified malfunction; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machines - Video Cameras
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-13) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (119-21) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (123-16) | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Recordings
Safety
Video
Electronic Surveillance
Equipment
Financial Institutions
Recordings
Safety
Video