MD HB1026 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a new member to the Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission who lived in and experienced poverty in Maryland and who was, within the past 3 years before appointment to the Commission, a recipient of public assistance based on the individual's poverty.
Title
Human Services - Two Generation Family Economic Security Commission - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673622/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
Welfare
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services - Generally
Welfare
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 2 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |