MD HB1024 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified individuals who are serving in specified elected or appointed positions from being members of the Employees' Pension System while serving in those positions.
Title
Employees' Pension System - Elected or Appointed Officials - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {334768/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Gaming
Judges
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
State Pensions and Retirement
State's Attorneys
Counties
Gaming
Judges
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Orphans' Court
Public Officials
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
Sheriffs
State Pensions and Retirement
State's Attorneys