MD HB1022 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a nursing home, on request by the Maryland Department of Health, to electronically submit clinical information to the State designated exchange to facilitate certain objectives; providing that information submitted under the Act may be combined with other data maintained by the exchange to facilitate a state health improvement program, mitigate a public health emergency, and improve patient safety; providing that information submitted by a nursing home may be used only to facilitate certain objectives; etc.
Title
Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Clinical Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 790 |
2021-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {516288/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB748 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 791
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Claims
Commerce and Business
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Nursing Homes
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Claims
Commerce and Business
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Federal Government
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Nursing Homes
Privacy
Public Health
Public Officials
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 302.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |