MD HB1021 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a certain licensed firearms dealer from storing a firearm on a certain premises where the licensed firearms dealer conducts business, unless the premises is equipped with certain security features; requiring a licensed firearms dealer to lock certain firearms in a certain location outside business hours; and requiring the Secretary of State Police to suspend or revoke a certain dealer's license if the dealer is found in violation of certain offenses.
Title
Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Overridden (Y: 29 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Overridden (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 243125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 723923/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 103228/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 213227/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 693025/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 243921/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 163726/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 993424/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - Overridden (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 243125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 723923/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 103228/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 213227/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 693025/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 14 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 243921/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 163726/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 993424/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Overridden (29-13) |
2022-04-09 | House | Overridden (97-40) |
2022-04-08 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2022-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted (32-14) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243125/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-30) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {723923/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-30) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {103228/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-30) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {213227/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-29) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {693025/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-30) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243921/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {163726/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (18-28) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {993424/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (17-28) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {993424/1 (Senator Hough) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Evening Session (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-29) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-38) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {213222/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Guns
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Recordings
Repeat Offenders
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Security Alarms
State Police, Department of
Storage
Video
Crimes and Punishments
Dealers
Guns
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Recordings
Repeat Offenders
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Security Alarms
State Police, Department of
Storage
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |