MD HB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from one to three the number of students authorized to work under the supervision of a master barber.
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Barbers - Additional Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |