MD HB1021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of License Commissioners to issue notice of the date, time, and location of a hearing, as soon as practicable after the hearing is scheduled, to all specified municipalities, civic associations, homeowners' associations, and condominium associations under specified circumstances; authorizing specified entities that request to receive notice under the Act to elect to receive written or electronic notice; increasing specified annual license fees in Prince George's County; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Walker) Rejected (27-104) (Y: 27 N: 104 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Walker) Rejected (27-104) (Y: 27 N: 104 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2016-04-11 | House | Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate Walker) Rejected (27-104) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {964638/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {453891/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Beverage Containers
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Census
Citations
Code Counties
Cooperative Associations
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Food
Hearings
Indigent Persons
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Associations
Beverage Containers
Blue Laws
Boundaries
Census
Citations
Code Counties
Cooperative Associations
Electronic Government
Fees
Fines
Food
Hearings
Indigent Persons
Law Enforcement
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prince George's County
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes