MD HB1020 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Developmental Disabilities Administration to establish and provide training materials to coordinators of community services on self-directed services; requiring coordinators of community services to educate a certain recipient on all models of services available to the recipient at certain times; providing for the services and manner of delivering services that the Administration provides to a recipient who receives self-directed services; etc.
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act of 2022)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736 |
2022-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Cox) Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {103621/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB868 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Federal Aid
Home Care Services
Job Training
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Communications
Community Facilities and Services
Developmental Disabilities
Federal Aid
Home Care Services
Job Training
Public Health
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 7 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 7 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |