MD HB102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a prohibition, in Anne Arundel County, on a person standing in a specified highway to solicit money or donations; authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in the county to enact a specified permit program to allow individuals, of at least 18 years of age, or representatives of specified qualified organizations, who are 18 years old, to stand in a roadway, median divider, or an intersection to solicit money or donations from the occupant of a vehicle under specified conditions: etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-9) (Y: 129 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-9) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {400610/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Advertising
Age of Majority
Anne Arundel County
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Education
Fire Protection
Gifts
Highways
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Safety
Solicitation
Transportation - Highways
Veterans
Age of Majority
Anne Arundel County
Churches
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Counties - Local Laws
County Councils
Education
Fire Protection
Gifts
Highways
Licenses
Motor Vehicles
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Safety
Solicitation
Transportation - Highways
Veterans