MD HB1019 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to adopt, on or before July 1, 2013, specified written policies relating to the procurement of green product cleaning supplies subject to specified exceptions; and requiring a county board, on or before June 30 each year, to provide written notice to the State Department of Education if it does not procure green product cleaning supplies for use in the schools because doing so is not practicable or economically feasible.
Title
County Boards of Education - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - Written Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (127-5) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments 765968/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education, Boards of
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Notices
Procurement
Public Schools
Environmental Matters
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Notices
Procurement
Public Schools