MD HB1018 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from purchasing a firearm from a certain online vendor unless a licensed firearm dealer facilitates the sale with the purchaser and the online vendor; requiring a certain licensed firearm dealer facilitating an online sale of a firearm to process the sale in a certain manner and comply with certain federal and State laws; and establishing certain criminal penalties for knowingly violating the Act.
Title
Public Safety – Online Firearm Sales – Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Guns
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Repeat Offenders
Transfer of Goods
Criminal Background Investigations
Dealers
Electronic Commerce
Fees
Guns
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Public Safety
Records
Repeat Offenders
Transfer of Goods
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 147 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |