MD HB1016 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB845 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Work, Labor and Employment
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Gifts
Grants
Higher Education
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 24 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |