MD HB1014 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the General Assembly may authorize, by law, the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue certain sports wagering licenses; providing that a license may be issued only to the holder of a video lottery operation license or a license for mile thoroughbred racing or harness racing; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that State revenues generated by the proposed sports wagering be used for dedicated purposes including public education; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Del. Frank Turner [D] | Del. Anne Kaiser [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Eric Luedtke [D] |
Del. Jay Walker [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-14) (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-14) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {395665/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Constitutional Amendments
Education
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Gaming
General Assembly
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Notices
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Education
Elections, State Board of
Federal Government
Gaming
General Assembly
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Notices
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation