MD HB1013 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Transportation to conduct a study and make certain recommendations on roadway surface material; establishing the purpose of the study; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Transportation - Study on Roadway Surface Material

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback